Accounts and annual returns THE GUARDIAN TRUST

Charity number: 279168
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 April 2021 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 November 2020 290 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 07 May 2019 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required