Financial history ST THOMAS GARNET SCHOOL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 279608
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £683.30k £749.50k £784.89k £681.48k £453.86k
Total expenditure £639.96k £676.15k £701.71k £720.44k £929.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £83.57k £99.61k £151.65k £103.50k £153.15k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £192 £100 £23 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £661.86k £727.74k £762.39k £667.05k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £21.44k £21.57k £21.50k £14.41k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £900 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £639.96k £676.15k £701.71k £720.44k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £56.97k £48.38k £54.62k £58.40k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A