Accounts and annual returns THE MOUNT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279893
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 12 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 12 November 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2014 01 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 25 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not submitted