Financial history THE MOUNT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279893
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015
Total gross income £2.41k £3.50k £13.71k £11.54k £49.39k
Total expenditure £3.41k £7.11k £13.23k £5.12k £3.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £955