Accounts and annual returns AYTHORPE RODING RECREATION COUNCIL

Charity Number: 280237
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 28 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 01 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 25 February 2010 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 July 2009 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required