Accounts and annual returns THE MAX PERUTZ FUND
Charity number: 280871
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 08 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | 04 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 10 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 10 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 14 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 14 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 07 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 07 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 09 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 09 June 2006 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window