Financial history THE MAX PERUTZ FUND

Charity number: 280871
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 31/01/2010
Total gross income £39.05k £35.38k £316.76k £280.85k £185.64k
Total expenditure £5.23k £46.39k £37.86k £52.05k £43.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A