Accounts and annual returns THE CHINGFORD ASSOCIATION FOR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity Number: 281032
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 02 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 01 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 14 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required