Financial history THE CHINGFORD ASSOCIATION FOR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 281032
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £6.95k £5.65k £3.41k £2.30k £2.61k
Total expenditure £6.61k £5.29k £6.62k £5.46k £5.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A