Financial history ASHAM TRUST

Charity number: 281849
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011
Total gross income £4.86k £3.31k £4.17k £7.03k £2.59k
Total expenditure £4.32k £4.70k £3.71k £6.40k £3.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A