Financial history PRESTWOOD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 282531
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £1.95k £1.36k £1.63k £1.54k £1.80k
Total expenditure £1.96k £1.53k £1.55k £1.74k £1.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A