Accounts and annual returns THE SPRINGWOOD HIGH SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 283218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 June 2024 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required