Accounts and annual returns THE FORTUNE TRUST

Charity number: 284025
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 24 October 2019 On Time