Financial history THE FORTUNE TRUST

Charity number: 284025
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £210.25k £1.90k £201.28k £5.60k £3.83k
Total expenditure £212.99k £500 £200.00k £4.40k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A