Accounts and annual returns DYSTROPHIC EPIDERMOLYSIS BULLOSA RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 284754
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 21 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 21 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 24 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 24 May 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 07 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 26 May 2005 On Time