Governing document DYSTROPHIC EPIDERMOLYSIS BULLOSA RESEARCH ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH DECEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 18TH MAY 1980 17TH MAY 1981 20TH MAY 1984 20TH MAY 1989 AND 18TH MAY 1991.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INTO THE CAUSE NATURAL TREATMENT AND CURE OF DYSTROPHY EPIDERMOLYSIS BULLOSA AND OTHER RELATED DISEASES. 2. TO RELIEVE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL ILLNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE SAID DISEASES BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL ADVICE GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT FOR THE PERSONS RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR WELFARE AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE COMMITTEE OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.