Accounts and annual returns COWDEN VILLAGE HALL (COMMONLY KNOWN AS COWDEN MEMORIAL HALL)

Charity number: 286856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 August 2024 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required