Accounts and annual returns HANHAM TODDLERS PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 287553
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 July 2022 1 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 March 2020 On Time