Accounts and annual returns THE SYCAMORE TRUST

Charity number: 287668
Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required