Financial history INFORMATION SERVICES CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 289076
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £1.32m £1.20m £1.22m £1.19m £1.20m
Total expenditure £1.30m £1.32m £1.22m £1.22m £1.21m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.20k £950
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £20.98k £16.94k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.17m £1.10m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £268 £86.51k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.18m £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £24.55k £23.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £61.35k