Accounts and annual returns URSULINE COLLEGE PARENT'S AND FRIENDS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289842
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2014 20 July 2015 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not Required