Financial history URSULINE COLLEGE PARENT'S AND FRIENDS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289842
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014
Total gross income £3.14k £2.59k £2.47k £2.92k £276
Total expenditure £2.52k £3.02k £6.71k £1.45k £317
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A