Accounts and annual returns MARLIN SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 291026
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required