Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN THE THEOLOGIAN GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 291884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 27 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 April 2025 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 April 2025 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 February 2022 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 February 2022 101 days late Download Open in new window