Accounts and annual returns KETTERING CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 293503
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 22 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 24 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 22 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 22 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 21 February 2008 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 21 February 2008 21 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 20 February 2007 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 22 February 2007 22 days late