Trustees THE KINGS LYNN GYMNASTICS CLUB
Charity number: 293550

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Sayer | Chair | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lianne Beasley | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karyn Hardy | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Elizabeth High | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Law | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Snaith | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zea Minns | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Pearman Secretary | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Clare | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Heather Wright | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Eggleton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jimmy Xu | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.