Accounts and annual returns CHERWELL CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 295317
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 26 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 07 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 02 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required