Financial history CHERWELL CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 295317
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £2.39k £3.82k £3.23k £5.20k £1.66k
Total expenditure £1.93k £1.84k £1.90k £800 £88
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A