Accounts and annual returns PARENTS' AND TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION OF PARKSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Charity number: 295429
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 30 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 21 October 2015 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 09 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 09 November 2013 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window