Financial history PARENTS' AND TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION OF PARKSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Charity number: 295429
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £1.01k £3.39k £8.48k £0 £0
Total expenditure £402 £4.24k £4.26k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A