Financial history NEWHAM BOYS' CLUB

Charity number: 296255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £20.36k £1 £4.10k £6.20k £9.09k
Total expenditure £11.00k £1 £13.58k £14.95k £13.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A