Accounts and annual returns LEIGH EVENING W1

Charity Number: 297011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 April 2025 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2025 440 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 April 2023 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 March 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required