Financial history LEIGH EVENING W1

Charity Number: 297011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.72k £971 £1.53k £1.60k £1.04k
Total expenditure £7.73k £1.25k £1.84k £1.70k £830
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A