Accounts and annual returns THE LUNDY PONY PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 297119
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 14 February 2012 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 02 March 2011 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required