Governing document THE LUNDY PONY PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Charity number: 297119
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF SOCIETY DATED 14TH MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 29TH MAY 1987 AND 9TH APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1991 AND 10 FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF BREEDING OF THE BRAETOR LUNDY PONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.