Accounts and annual returns TWELFTH DUKE OF BEDFORD SETTLEMENT OF 11 JUNE 1946

Charity number: 297528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 27 May 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 March 2023 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 March 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required