Financial history TWELFTH DUKE OF BEDFORD SETTLEMENT OF 11 JUNE 1946

Charity number: 297528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £10.08k £7.95k £7.32k £8.86k £9.26k
Total expenditure £53.25k £2.13k £20.89k £14.91k £14.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A