Accounts and annual returns THE BOND OF FRIENDSHIP NO 8457 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 298221
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2017 04 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 10 April 2017 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required