Financial history THE BOND OF FRIENDSHIP NO 8457 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 298221
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £1.36k £1.29k £510 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £2.11k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0