Financial history FRIENDS OF POTTERS BAR COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 298373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.62k £702 £4.33k £659 £2.19k
Total expenditure £4.51k £1.65k £14.70k £824 £781
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A