Governing document FRIENDS OF POTTERS BAR COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Charity number: 298373

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 14TH DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED ON 7TH DECEMBER 1994, 10TH MAY 1995, 7 MAY 2008 AND 6 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
A) TO ASSIST PATIENTS AND STAFF OF POTTERS BAR COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND GENERALLY SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL B) WHEN POSSIBLE PROVIDE FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS OR STAFF TO ASSIST THE EFFICIENT RUNNING OF THE HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
POTTERS BAR
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.