Financial history KENT GUILD OF SPINNERS DYERS AND WEAVERS

Charity number: 298446
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £2.92k £2.75k £2.80k £2.81k £2.42k
Total expenditure £3.90k £2.75k £2.22k £2.79k £1.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A