Governing document KENT GUILD OF SPINNERS DYERS AND WEAVERS
Charity number: 298446
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOV 1986 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCT 1987 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 1992 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2008 AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF CRAFTMANSHIP IN HAND-WEAVING, SPINNING AND DYEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SUCH CRAFTMANSHIP.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
KENT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.