Accounts and annual returns NORFOLK HOMEMAKERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 298534
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2016 17 May 2017 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 17 May 2017 47 days late
Annual return 31 May 2015 15 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2015 Not Required