Financial history THE CENTRAL GIFTS COMMITTEE OF THE CHURCHES OF GOD

Charity number: 299106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.66m £945.50k £790.10k £1.52m £1.68m
Total expenditure £853.60k £924.95k £844.15k £1.01m £1.39m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.63m £925.27k £772.21k £1.51m £1.66m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £13.69k £8.18k £8.04k £7.38k £7.14k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.81k £12.04k £9.85k £8.79k £10.23k
Income - Other £1.41k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.03m £113.47k £55.26k £623.50k £948.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £845.38k £916.59k £835.21k £1.00m £1.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.22k £8.36k £8.94k £9.08k £9.79k
Expenditure - Governance £29.05k £26.81k £24.11k £21.05k £32.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £8.22k £8.36k £8.94k £9.08k £9.79k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0