Financial history FRIENDS OF VICTORIA HOSPITAL WIMBORNE

Charity number: 299230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £442.18k £292.92k £1.04m £1.45m £404.16k
Total expenditure £146.24k £73.28k £102.96k £363.12k £1.77m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £29.24k £3.21k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £973.32k £1.38m N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £53.81k £47.94k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £10.47k £10.37k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £3.21k £16.23k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £961.95k £1.37m N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £101.86k £361.65k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £1.10k £1.47k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.82k £6.95k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A