Financial history IRON ACTON PARISH HALL

Charity number: 301553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.87k £18.57k £25.58k £22.33k £25.73k
Total expenditure £20.18k £11.60k £17.01k £20.86k £25.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £4.76k N/A N/A