Trustees IRON ACTON PARISH HALL
Charity number: 301553

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David James Hatherell | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Smith | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Wright | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annie Smith | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Hunt | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Weldrake | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Patrick Barker | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul Sharp | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Rickard | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Spencer Bourns | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ann Mee | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Smith | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Margaret Byrne | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PATRICIA GADSBY | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN MILLWARD | Trustee | 03 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN HILARY WILTSHIRE | Trustee | 03 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.