Accounts and annual returns KINGSBRIDGE DARTMOUTH AND TOTNES YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE

Charity number: 1068553
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 08 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 20 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 13 November 2008 On Time