Financial history CROSS MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 1071933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.93k £10.99k £5.12k £4.20k £3.91k
Total expenditure £3.49k £5.93k £7.96k £3.29k £7.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A